Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Privatization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 (SB0708)
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0075)
Title
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 /CH0106
Title
Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority - Small Business Surety Bond Program
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0936 /CH0290
Title
Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Construction Contracts - Security Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943 /CH0141 (SB0776)
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986
Title
State Government - Maryland Commission on Efficiency in Government
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213 (SB0662/CH0191)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - One Maryland Blue Ribbon Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 (HB0538)
Title
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453
Title
Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Construction Contracts - Security Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0191 (HB1213)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - One Maryland Blue Ribbon Commission
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683
Title
State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - Established
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0119)
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB0943/CH0141)
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose Projects Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0066 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0119 (SB0708) Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act) Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0538 (SB0075) Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0844 /CH0106 Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority - Small Business Surety Bond Program Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0936 /CH0290 Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Construction Contracts - Security Requirements Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 /CH0141 (SB0776) Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0986 State Government - Maryland Commission on Efficiency in Government Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 (SB0662/CH0191) State Finance and Procurement - One Maryland Blue Ribbon Commission Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0075 (HB0538) Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0453 Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Construction Contracts - Security Requirements Senator Guzzone 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0662 /CH0191 (HB1213) State Finance and Procurement - One Maryland Blue Ribbon Commission Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - Established Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0119) Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act) Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0776 (HB0943/CH0141) Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM