Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Privatization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 /CH0830
Title
Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1556
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Public Notice of Solicitations and Approval of Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1149
Title
Appropriations and Public–Private Partnerships – Transit Lines – Three–Station Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0816 /CH0830 Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - Alterations Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1556 Public-Private Partnerships - Public Notice of Solicitations and Approval of Agreements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1149 Appropriations and Public–Private Partnerships – Transit Lines – Three–Station Requirement Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM
Click to return on the top page