Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Privatization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Presolicitation Reports - Environmental Impact Statement Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 (SB0742)
Title
State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695 (SB0788)
Title
Transportation Climate Accountability Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0731)
Title
Build to Learn Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402 (SB1011/CH0387)
Title
Prince George's County - Public School Construction - Prince George's County Alternative Financing Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 /CH0035
Title
Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 (HB0224)
Title
State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB0695)
Title
Transportation Climate Accountability Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 /CH0387 (HB1402)
Title
Prince George’s County – Public School Construction – Prince George’s County Public–Private Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0091 Public-Private Partnerships - Presolicitation Reports - Environmental Impact Statement Requirement Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 10:30 a.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 1/22 at 10:30 a.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
1/22/2019 - 10:30 AM
Appropriations
1/22/2019 - 10:30 AM
HB0224 (SB0742) State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0695 (SB0788) Transportation Climate Accountability Act of 2019 Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0727 (SB0731) Build to Learn Act of 2019 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1402 (SB1011/CH0387) Prince George's County - Public School Construction - Prince George's County Alternative Financing Fund Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771) The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Ways and Means
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0521 /CH0035 Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 (HB0224) State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0788 (HB0695) Transportation Climate Accountability Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 /CH0387 (HB1402) Prince George’s County – Public School Construction – Prince George’s County Public–Private Partnership Fund Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM