Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Privileged Communications

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0581)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 (SB0586)
Title
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624 (SB0593)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093
Title
Baltimore County Circuit Court - Criminal Proceedings Court Webcast - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 (HB0170)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 (HB0369)
Title
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Request to Intervene
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB0624)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0170 (SB0581) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0369 (SB0586) Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0624 (SB0593) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1093 Baltimore County Circuit Court - Criminal Proceedings Court Webcast - Pilot Program Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 (HB0170) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
SB0586 (HB0369) Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Request to Intervene Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0593 (HB0624) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:29 PM