Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Process Serving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192 (SB0156)
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to Repossess
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0554)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 (HB0192)
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB1291)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0325
Title
Courts - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 /CH0079
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0192 (SB0156) Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to Repossess Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0554) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1340 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1427 State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0156 (HB0192) Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0554 (HB1291) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 /CH0325 Courts - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1001 /CH0079 Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Extension Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM