Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Process Serving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857
Title
Courts - Attorneys - Subpoena Procedures and Forms for Circuit Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of Process
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1293
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Servers - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1529 (SB1095)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838
Title
Private Process Servers - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1095 (HB1529)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0857 Courts - Attorneys - Subpoena Procedures and Forms for Circuit Courts Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0867 Maryland False Claims Act Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of Process Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1221 Discovery - Disclosures Regarding Anonymous Internet Communications Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1293 Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Servers - Registration Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1529 (SB1095) Real Property - Ground Rents Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0838 Private Process Servers - Licensing Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1095 (HB1529) Real Property - Ground Rents Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM
Click to return on the top page