Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Process Serving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0374/CH0165)
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0428
Title
Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1050
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Installment Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195 (SB0877)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0851)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 /CH0325
Title
Civil Actions - Disclosure of Information - Repeal of Certification Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 /CH0165 (HB0405)
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0380
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 (HB1232)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1195)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0405 (SB0374/CH0165) Maryland False Claims Act Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0511 /CH0428 Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1050 Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Installment Agreements Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1195 (SB0877) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 (SB0851) Real Property - Ground Rents Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0145 /CH0325 Civil Actions - Disclosure of Information - Repeal of Certification Requirement Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0374 /CH0165 (HB0405) Maryland False Claims Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0380 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0851 (HB1232) Real Property - Ground Rents Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1195) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM