Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Process Serving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 (SB0430)
Title
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534 /CH0489 (SB0924)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0801)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Family Law - Automatic Injunction
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220 /CH0136
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 (HB0512)
Title
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565
Title
Civil Actions - Offers of Judgment
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566
Title
Medical Malpractice - Notice of Intent to File Claim
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636
Title
Medical Malpractice - Discovery
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB0796)
Title
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890
Title
Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB0534/CH0489)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0512 (SB0430) Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 /CH0489 (SB0924) Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Repeal Delegate Sanchez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0757 Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0801) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0992 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 Family Law - Automatic Injunction Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 /CH0136 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0430 (HB0512) Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 Civil Actions - Offers of Judgment Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 Medical Malpractice - Notice of Intent to File Claim Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 Medical Malpractice - Discovery Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB0796) Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0890 Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0924 (HB0534/CH0489) Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Repeal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM