Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Process Serving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Landlord-Tenant Action - Body Attachment - Prohibition (Jared Kushner Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 /CH0783 (SB0861)
Title
Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB1050)
Title
Civil Actions – Body Attachment – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0250
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 /CH0646 (SB1102/CH0645)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of Process
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1646 /CH0251 (SB1036)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1726
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body Attachments
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB1023/CH0783)
Title
Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB1646/CH0251)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050 (HB1081)
Title
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1102 /CH0645 (HB1329/CH0646)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of Process
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0545 Landlord-Tenant Action - Body Attachment - Prohibition (Jared Kushner Act) Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0942 Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1023 /CH0783 (SB0861) Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1081 (SB1050) Civil Actions – Body Attachment – Procedures Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 /CH0250 Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
HB1329 /CH0646 (SB1102/CH0645) Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of Process Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1646 /CH0251 (SB1036) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1726 Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0442 Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body Attachments Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0861 (HB1023/CH0783) Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1036 (HB1646/CH0251) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1050 (HB1081) Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1102 /CH0645 (HB1329/CH0646) Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of Process Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM