Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Process Serving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 /CH0260 (SB0138/CH0261)
Title
Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
Anne Arundel County - Service of Summary Ejectment Papers - Sheriff's Surcharge and Authorization for Private Process Server
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 /CH0261 (HB0573/CH0260)
Title
Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 126
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0458 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0573 /CH0260 (SB0138/CH0261) Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 260
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0976 Anne Arundel County - Service of Summary Ejectment Papers - Sheriff's Surcharge and Authorization for Private Process Server Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0138 /CH0261 (HB0573/CH0260) Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees Senator Cassilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 261
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2020 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0680 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:32 PM