Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Program Open Space

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123
Title
Program Open Space - Use of Funds - Artificial Turf Surfaces
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 (SB0462)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Carrollton Playground and Open Space Project
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 409-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 /CH0452
Title
Program Open Space Sites - Public Access
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462 (HB0505)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Carrollton Playground and Open Space Project
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0123 Program Open Space - Use of Funds - Artificial Turf Surfaces Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0505 (SB0462) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Carrollton Playground and Open Space Project Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 10:00 AM
HB1013 Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 409-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 /CH0452 Program Open Space Sites - Public Access Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0462 (HB0505) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Carrollton Playground and Open Space Project Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM
Click to return on the top page