Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Program Open Space

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597 (SB0867)
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 407-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 (SB0357)
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0448
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0134)
Title
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 (HB1091)
Title
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 (HB0631)
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 (HB0597)
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0597 (SB0867) Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 407-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0631 (SB0357) Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0675 /CH0448 Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 (SB0134) Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0134 (HB1091) Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0171 Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0357 (HB0631) Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment Senator McFadden 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0867 (HB0597) Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM