Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Program Open Space

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265
Title
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Fund - Phased-In Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267 /CH0660 (SB0257/CH0661)
Title
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1154 /CH0407
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Use of Grant Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438 (SB0896)
Title
Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0406
Title
Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 /CH0661 (HB0267/CH0660)
Title
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0692
Title
State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896 (HB1438)
Title
Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0265 Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Fund - Phased-In Increase Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0267 /CH0660 (SB0257/CH0661) Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1154 /CH0407 Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Use of Grant Funds Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1438 (SB0896) Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
SB0116 /CH0406 Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of Funds Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 /CH0661 (HB0267/CH0660) Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0692 State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0896 (HB1438) Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM