Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Prostitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241 (SB0904)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0905
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0003)
Title
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0357
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 (HB0241)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0008)
Title
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0241 (SB0904) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0905 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0003) Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0520 /CH0357 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 (HB0241) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 (HJ0008) Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM
Click to return on the top page