Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prostitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0610
Title
Department of State Police - Investigation Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Related Crimes - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 (SB0527)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 (SB0903)
Title
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 (SB0866)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0865)
Title
Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - Fine
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484 (SB0015)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 (HB1484)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 (HB0219)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 (HB1089)
Title
Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - Fine
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866 (HB0623)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking Victim
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB0519)
Title
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 /CH0610 Department of State Police - Investigation Authority Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0101 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Related Crimes - Penalties Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0219 (SB0527) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0519 (SB0903) Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 (SB0866) Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking Victim Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0811 Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1089 (SB0865) Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - Fine Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1273 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1484 (SB0015) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0015 (HB1484) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0527 (HB0219) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0865 (HB1089) Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - Fine Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0866 (HB0623) Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking Victim Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0903 (HB0519) Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM