Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prostitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202 (SB1018)
Title
Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Diversionary Docket and Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271
Title
Criminal Law - Prostitution and Assignation - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018 (HB1202)
Title
Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1202 (SB1018) Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Diversionary Docket and Workgroup Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 Criminal Law - Prostitution and Assignation - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 (HB1202) Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Workgroup Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM