Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prostitution -see also- Human Trafficking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0691)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 /CH0021 (SB0690/CH0022)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Penalties (Human Trafficking Reform Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690 /CH0022 (HB0871/CH0021)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0782)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0782 (SB0691) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0871 /CH0021 (SB0690/CH0022) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1039 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Penalties (Human Trafficking Reform Act) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0690 /CH0022 (HB0871/CH0021) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0782) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM