Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Prostitution -see also- Human Trafficking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 (SB0365)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575
Title
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245
Title
Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 (SB1044)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0501)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044 (HB1592)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 126
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0459 Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0501 (SB0365) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 370
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0974 Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1592 (SB1044) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0365 (HB0501) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1044 (HB1592) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:30 PM