Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 (SB0315/CH0338)
Title
Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 (SB0269/CH0335)
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 /CH0233
Title
Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0468)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 /CH0418 (SB0270)
Title
Protective Order and Peace Order Petitions - Maryland Residents
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 (SB0477/CH0354)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807 (SB0277)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269 /CH0335 (HB0225)
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0390/CH0418)
Title
Protective Order and Peace Order Petitions - Maryland Residents
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 (HB0807)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 /CH0338 (HB0224)
Title
Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0348)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 /CH0354 (HB0606)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0224 (SB0315/CH0338) Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order Delegate Dumais 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0225 (SB0269/CH0335) Domestic Violence - Additional Relief Delegate Dumais 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0263 /CH0233 Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0348 (SB0468) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0390 /CH0418 (SB0270) Protective Order and Peace Order Petitions - Maryland Residents Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0494 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0606 (SB0477/CH0354) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0807 (SB0277) Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Delegate Glass 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0269 /CH0335 (HB0225) Domestic Violence - Additional Relief Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 (HB0390/CH0418) Protective Order and Peace Order Petitions - Maryland Residents Senator Lee 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0277 (HB0807) Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0315 /CH0338 (HB0224) Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0348) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0477 /CH0354 (HB0606) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM