Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004 (SB0977)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 /CH0551 (SB0346/CH0550)
Title
Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 (SB0430)
Title
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534 /CH0489 (SB0924)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 (SB0638)
Title
Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819
Title
Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Probation and Suspended Sentence
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 (SB0833)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 (SB0930)
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Model Residential Leases - Required Contents
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1480
Title
Background Check Accountability Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 /CH0550 (HB0314/CH0551)
Title
Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 (HB0512)
Title
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0573)
Title
Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB0866)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB0534/CH0489)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 (HB0004)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 (SB0977) Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0314 /CH0551 (SB0346/CH0550) Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0512 (SB0430) Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 /CH0489 (SB0924) Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Repeal Delegate Sanchez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0573 (SB0638) Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced Penalties Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0819 Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Probation and Suspended Sentence Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 (SB0833) Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 (SB0930) Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1060 Model Residential Leases - Required Contents Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1263 Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced Penalties Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1480 Background Check Accountability Act of 2016 Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0346 /CH0550 (HB0314/CH0551) Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0430 (HB0512) Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 (HB0573) Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced Penalties Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 (HB0866) Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0924 (HB0534/CH0489) Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Repeal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0977 (HB0004) Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM