Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189 (SB0497)
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Protective Order and Peace Order
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0250
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1303 /CH0425 (SB0491/CH0426)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1562
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Surrender of Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491 /CH0426 (HB1303/CH0425)
Title
Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB1189)
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Protective Order and Peace Order
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 /CH0366
Title
Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1263
Title
Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0599 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1189 (SB0497) Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Protective Order and Peace Order Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 /CH0250 Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
HB1303 /CH0425 (SB0491/CH0426) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1562 Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Surrender of Firearms Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1628 Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0491 /CH0426 (HB1303/CH0425) Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0497 (HB1189) Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Protective Order and Peace Order Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 /CH0366 Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1263 Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM