Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 (SB0209)
Title
Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253
Title
Final Protective Orders – Relief – Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0241)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 (SB0363)
Title
Election Law - Voting Systems - Accessibility for Voters With Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0640 (SB0555)
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0320)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975 (SB0907)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
Civil Law – Jury Proceedings – Fundamental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0122)
Title
Peace Orders – Relief Eligibility and Duration – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0241 (HB0363)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 (HB0848)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 /CH0458
Title
Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 (HB0640)
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 (HB0786)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, Transfers, and Loans
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0975)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 (SB0209) Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (117-18)
Judiciary
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0253 Final Protective Orders – Relief – Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0363 (SB0241) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0565 (SB0363) Election Law - Voting Systems - Accessibility for Voters With Disabilities Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0640 (SB0555) Peace Orders - Workplace Violence Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0848 (SB0320) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/01/2019 - 11:30 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0850 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0975 (SB0907) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 Civil Law – Jury Proceedings – Fundamental Rights Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0122) Peace Orders – Relief Eligibility and Duration – Rape and Sexual Offenses Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0241 (HB0363) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0320 (HB0848) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0346 /CH0458 Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 (HB0640) Peace Orders - Workplace Violence Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0737 (HB0786) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, Transfers, and Loans Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0907 (HB0975) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM