Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Psychiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0807)
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 (HB1339)
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0641 /CH0196 (SB0803/CH0195) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 (SB0807) Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and Reporting Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 /CH0195 (HB0641/CH0196) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 (HB1339) Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and Reporting Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM