Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Psychiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367 /CH0416 (SB0469)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 (SB0617)
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0676)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of Damages
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469 (HB0367/CH0416)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 (HB0908)
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1021)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0367 /CH0416 (SB0469) Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 (SB0617) Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 (SB0676) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1214 Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of Damages Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0469 (HB0367/CH0416) Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0617 (HB0908) Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB1021) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM
Click to return on the top page