Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Psychiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0418)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 (SB0858)
Title
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0404)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 (HB0579)
Title
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0241 (HB1561)
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0404 (SB0418) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0579 (SB0858) Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0404) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 (HB0579) Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1081 /CH0241 (HB1561) Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM