Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Psychiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 (SB0402)
Title
Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605 /CH0479 (SB0524/CH0480)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897
Title
Health - Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Limited Private Inpatient Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 /CH0481
Title
Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance - Telepsychiatry - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402 (HB0306)
Title
Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 /CH0480 (HB0605/CH0479)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635
Title
Mental Health - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0944 /CH0482
Title
Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0306 (SB0402) Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 /CH0479 (SB0524/CH0480) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0897 Health - Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Limited Private Inpatient Facilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1122 /CH0481 Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
HB1200 Maryland Medical Assistance - Telepsychiatry - Requirements Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0402 (HB0306) Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0524 /CH0480 (HB0605/CH0479) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Telemedicine – Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners and Psychiatrists Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0635 Mental Health - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0944 /CH0482 Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM