Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Psychologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 (SB0121)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Incapacity to Make Informed Decision - Certification by Psychologist
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 /CH0219 (SB0254/CH0218)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 (SB0345)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 (SB0611)
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809
Title
Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810
Title
Mental Health Professionals - Duty to Report Risk of Serious Harm - Firearm Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310 (SB0834)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1355
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Application Fee and Mental Health Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121 (HB0067)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Incapacity to Make Informed Decision - Certification by Psychologist
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 /CH0218 (HB0098/CH0219)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 (HB0274)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Licensure
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382
Title
Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 (HB0474)
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 (SB0121) Health Care Decisions Act - Incapacity to Make Informed Decision - Certification by Psychologist Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0098 /CH0219 (SB0254/CH0218) State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License Renewal Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0274 (SB0345) State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Registration Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0474 (SB0611) Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0809 Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from Disqualification Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0810 Mental Health Professionals - Duty to Report Risk of Serious Harm - Firearm Safety Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0821 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1310 (SB0834) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1355 Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Application Fee and Mental Health Certification Delegate Costa 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
Judiciary
SB0121 (HB0067) Health Care Decisions Act - Incapacity to Make Informed Decision - Certification by Psychologist Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Finance
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0254 /CH0218 (HB0098/CH0219) State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License Renewal Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0345 (HB0274) State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - Licensure Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of Firearms Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0611 (HB0474) Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM