Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Psychologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317 (SB0541)
Title
Mental Health - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515
Title
Public Schools - Staff Members - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 /CH0271
Title
Health Insurance – Provider Panels – Providers of Community–Based Health Services
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 /CH0356
Title
Washington County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072
Title
Prince George's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Primary and Specialty Health Care Providers
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1443 (SB0896)
Title
Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1530
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of School Psychology Services
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1652
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of School Psychology Services
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896 (HB1443)
Title
Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0317 (SB0541) Mental Health - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0515 Public Schools - Staff Members - Report Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0601 /CH0271 Health Insurance – Provider Panels – Providers of Community–Based Health Services Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 271
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0744 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0893 /CH0356 Washington County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 356
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1072 Prince George's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Primary and Specialty Health Care Providers Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training Delegate Jackson, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1443 (SB0896) Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1530 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of School Psychology Services Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1652 Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0634 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of School Psychology Services Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0896 (HB1443) Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:51 PM