Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Publications -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic Mail
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0262
Title
Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - Update
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0873)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 (SB0708)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and Instructors
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 /CH0496
Title
Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Public Hearing Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750
Title
Public Schools - Electronic Smoking Devices - Policy and Disciplinary Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0162 (SB0128/CH0161)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to Operate
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0128 /CH0161 (HB0878/CH0162)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to Operate
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0627)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and Instructors
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0416)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip Programs Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0200 Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic Mail Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0262 Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - Update Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0416 (SB0873) Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0453 Maryland Education Credit Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 (SB0708) Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and Instructors Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0727 /CH0496 Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Public Hearing Requirements Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0750 Public Schools - Electronic Smoking Devices - Policy and Disciplinary Standards Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Economic Matters
HB0878 /CH0162 (SB0128/CH0161) Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to Operate Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1201 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0128 /CH0161 (HB0878/CH0162) Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to Operate Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0627) Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and Instructors Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0873 (HB0416) Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM