Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Publications -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0552 (SB0516)
Title
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669 /CH0197
Title
Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Electronic Tip Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898 /CH0852
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163 /CH0643 (SB0976)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0587 (HB0390/CH0586)
Title
Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 (HB0078/CH0552)
Title
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976 (HB1163/CH0643)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020
Title
Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 /CH0552 (SB0516) State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2017 - 3:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0669 /CH0197 Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Electronic Tip Programs Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0898 /CH0852 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 /CH0643 (SB0976) Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 /CH0587 (HB0390/CH0586) Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 (HB0078/CH0552) State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act) Senator Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0976 (HB1163/CH0643) Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1020 Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017 Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM