Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Publications -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 (SB0149/CH0434)
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment PG 508-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 /CH0132
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice of Public Hearings on Regulations
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 (SB0610)
Title
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 /CH0281 (SB0892)
Title
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Courts - Business and Technology Court
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 /CH0032
Title
Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540
Title
Health Care Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1829
Title
Baltimore County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 /CH0434 (HB0104)
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610 (HB0766)
Title
Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB0874/CH0281)
Title
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Public Schools – Social Media Use by Educators
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 (SB0149/CH0434) Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations Delegate Robinson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0184 Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment PG 508-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0753 /CH0132 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice of Public Hearings on Regulations Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 (SB0610) Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0874 /CH0281 (SB0892) General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 AM
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1071 Courts - Business and Technology Court Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1386 /CH0032 Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1540 Health Care Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1829 Baltimore County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0149 /CH0434 (HB0104) Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0610 (HB0766) Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0892 (HB0874/CH0281) General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0904 Public Schools – Social Media Use by Educators Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM