Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0459/CH0504)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License MC 20-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0535 (SB0603/CH0534)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123
Title
Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0504 (HB0269)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License
Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467
Title
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 /CH0534 (HB0740/CH0535)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0985 /CH0365
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Center - Green Banks and Clean Bank Financing - Study
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0269 (SB0459/CH0504) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License MC 20-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0740 /CH0535 (SB0603/CH0534) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1123 Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014 Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1506 /CH0459 Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0459 /CH0504 (HB0269) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License Montgomery County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0467 Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements Senator Glassman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0603 /CH0534 (HB0740/CH0535) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund Senator DeGrange 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0985 /CH0365 Maryland Clean Energy Center - Green Banks and Clean Bank Financing - Study Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM