Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0468)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Executive Director and General Counsel - Appointment and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809 (SB0540/CH0181)
Title
Municipalities - Parking Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867
Title
Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943 /CH0141 (SB0776)
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986
Title
State Government - Maryland Commission on Efficiency in Government
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Innovation Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0348)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 /CH0181 (HB0809)
Title
Municipalities - Parking Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758
Title
State Government - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Web Sites
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB0943/CH0141)
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0348 (SB0468) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Executive Director and General Counsel - Appointment and Compensation Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0809 (SB0540/CH0181) Municipalities - Parking Authorities Delegate McMillan 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0867 Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State Policy Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 /CH0141 (SB0776) Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0986 State Government - Maryland Commission on Efficiency in Government Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1108 Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Innovation Initiative Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0348) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and Compensation Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0540 /CH0181 (HB0809) Municipalities - Parking Authorities Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 State Government - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Web Sites Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0776 (HB0943/CH0141) Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM