Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 (SB0085/CH0338)
Title
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383)
Title
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955 (SB0267)
Title
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404 /CH0034 (SB1130)
Title
Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1642 (SB1158/CH0713)
Title
Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0338 (HB0059)
Title
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 /CH0345
Title
Maryland Workforce Corporation and Health Care Personnel Training Fund - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 (HB0955)
Title
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0013 (HB0309)
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726 /CH0577 (HB0705)
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Center - Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1130 (HB1404/CH0034)
Title
Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of Fund
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1158 /CH0713 (HB1642)
Title
Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 (SB0085/CH0338) Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383) Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0955 (SB0267) Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 /CH0034 (SB1130) Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of Fund Delegate Brooks 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1642 (SB1158/CH0713) Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0085 /CH0338 (HB0059) Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0093 /CH0345 Maryland Workforce Corporation and Health Care Personnel Training Fund - Repeal Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0267 (HB0955) Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student Events Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0324 /CH0013 (HB0309) Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016 Senator Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0726 /CH0577 (HB0705) Maryland Clean Energy Center - Task Force Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1130 (HB1404/CH0034) Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of Fund Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1158 /CH0713 (HB1642) Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer Senator McFadden 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM