Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0856/CH0839)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 /CH0519
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Members and Employees of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control Boards
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Enterprise Fund - Start-Up Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856 /CH0839 (HB1291)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0856/CH0839) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1386 /CH0519 Maryland Public Ethics Law - Members and Employees of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control Boards Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1467 Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Enterprise Fund - Start-Up Businesses Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0856 /CH0839 (HB1291) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM