Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Presolicitation Reports - Environmental Impact Statement Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0487 (SB0340/CH0488)
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 (SB0781)
Title
Public-Private Partnership Projects - Real Property Acquisition - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0883)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0931)
Title
Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296 (SB0200)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 (HB0235)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 (HB1296)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340 /CH0488 (HB0543/CH0487)
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 (HB0663)
Title
Public-Private Partnership Projects - Real Property Acquisition - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB0990)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 (HB1257)
Title
Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0091 Public-Private Partnerships - Presolicitation Reports - Environmental Impact Statement Requirement Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 10:30 a.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 1/22 at 10:30 a.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
1/22/2019 - 10:30 AM
Appropriations
1/22/2019 - 10:30 AM
HB0543 /CH0487 (SB0340/CH0488) Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0663 (SB0781) Public-Private Partnership Projects - Real Property Acquisition - Prohibition Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0682 Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0716 State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act) Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 (SB0883) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 (SB0931) Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1296 (SB0200) State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0175 (HB0235) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0200 (HB1296) State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0340 /CH0488 (HB0543/CH0487) Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0781 (HB0663) Public-Private Partnership Projects - Real Property Acquisition - Prohibition Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB0990) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 (HB1257) Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM