Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Local Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223 /CH0138
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge - Affordable Housing Requirement (The Affordable Housing Act of 2018) PG 414-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0108
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 (SB0274)
Title
Carroll County - Coin Operated Games - Repeal of Licensing Requirements
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725
Title
Calvert County - Budget Changes - Publication and Hearing Threshold
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 /CH0114
Title
Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted Budget
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0520)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1553 /CH0637 (SB0826/CH0638)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0641)
Title
Carroll County - Coin Operated Games - Repeal of Licensing Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 (HB0832)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 /CH0638 (HB1553/CH0637)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0223 /CH0138 Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0235 Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge - Affordable Housing Requirement (The Affordable Housing Act of 2018) PG 414-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0275 /CH0108 St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0641 (SB0274) Carroll County - Coin Operated Games - Repeal of Licensing Requirements Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0725 Calvert County - Budget Changes - Publication and Hearing Threshold Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0729 /CH0114 Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted Budget Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0832 (SB0520) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1553 /CH0637 (SB0826/CH0638) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1580 Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0641) Carroll County - Coin Operated Games - Repeal of Licensing Requirements Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 (HB0832) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 /CH0638 (HB1553/CH0637) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM