Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Local Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 /CH0351
Title
Prince George’s County – School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges – Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 415–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278
Title
Baltimore City - Control of Police Department of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 /CH0167
Title
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 /CH0168
Title
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Housing Opportunities Commission MC 7-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500 (SB0286/CH0263)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 (SB0039/CH0074)
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 /CH0123 (SB0590/CH0124)
Title
Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 /CH0074 (HB0528)
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043
Title
Baltimore City – Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department – Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286 /CH0263 (HB0500)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 /CH0124 (HB0700/CH0123)
Title
Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0225 /CH0351 Prince George’s County – School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges – Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 415–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0278 Baltimore City - Control of Police Department of Baltimore City Delegate Branch 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0304 /CH0167 Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 /CH0168 Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Housing Opportunities Commission MC 7-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0500 (SB0286/CH0263) Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0528 (SB0039/CH0074) Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting Delegate Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0700 /CH0123 (SB0590/CH0124) Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0857 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0039 /CH0074 (HB0528) Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0043 Baltimore City – Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department – Residency Requirements Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-11)
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/04/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0286 /CH0263 (HB0500) Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0590 /CH0124 (HB0700/CH0123) Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM