Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Works

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0084 (SB0663)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0777)
Title
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603
Title
Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0448
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711
Title
Charles County - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0362/CH0027)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Town of Capitol Heights Public Works Modular Home
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
Harford County - Department of Public Works - Smart Water Meters
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333
Title
Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" Condemnation
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 /CH0027 (HB0902)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 (HB0296/CH0084)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 (HB0370)
Title
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899
Title
Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and Approval
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Delegate Jones 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0296 /CH0084 (SB0663) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0370 (SB0777) Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0675 /CH0448 Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 Charles County - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Authority Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0902 (SB0362/CH0027) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1228 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Town of Capitol Heights Public Works Modular Home Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB1292 Harford County - Department of Public Works - Smart Water Meters Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" Condemnation Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0362 /CH0027 (HB0902) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 (HB0296/CH0084) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0777 (HB0370) Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0899 Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and Approval Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM