Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Public Works

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Baltimore County - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177 /CH0097
Title
Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582 (SB0232)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610 (SB0995)
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014 (SB0578)
Title
Electricity – Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1048 (SB1011)
Title
Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128
Title
Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 (SB0955)
Title
Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543 (SB0912)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB1014)
Title
Electricity - Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB1543)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 /CH0590
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 (HB0610)
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB1048)
Title
Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0063 Baltimore County - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - Report Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0177 /CH0097 Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0582 (SB0232) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0610 (SB0995) Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1014 (SB0578) Electricity – Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1048 (SB1011) Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1128 Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act) Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1465 (SB0955) Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1543 (SB0912) Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0578 (HB1014) Electricity - Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 (HB1543) Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0987 /CH0590 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB0995 (HB0610) Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1011 (HB1048) Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:14 PM