Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Works, Board of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517
Title
Board of Public Works - State Wetlands Licenses - Best Interest of the State
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628 /CH0285 (SB0238/CH0284)
Title
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 (SB0709)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008 (SB0767)
Title
Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Capital Budget - Payment of State Debt Service
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238 /CH0284 (HB0628/CH0285)
Title
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326
Title
Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB0789)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 (HB1008)
Title
Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0517 Board of Public Works - State Wetlands Licenses - Best Interest of the State Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0628 /CH0285 (SB0238/CH0284) Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0789 (SB0709) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB1008 (SB0767) Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 Capital Budget - Payment of State Debt Service Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0238 /CH0284 (HB0628/CH0285) Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Senator Glassman 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0326 Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB0789) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Dyson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0767 (HB1008) Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM