Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Works, Board of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 (SB0708)
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486 (SB0595/CH0311)
Title
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Reorganization of State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
2-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or Hotline
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
State Budget - Board of Public Works - Notice of Reductions in Appropriations
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 /CH0303
Title
Procurement - Contracts for Pretreatment and Removal of Snow and Ice
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 /CH0311 (HB0486)
Title
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0119)
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0119 (SB0708) Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act) Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Delegate Jones 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0486 (SB0595/CH0311) Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 Reorganization of State Procurement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 2-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or Hotline Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 State Budget - Board of Public Works - Notice of Reductions in Appropriations Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 /CH0303 Procurement - Contracts for Pretreatment and Removal of Snow and Ice Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0595 /CH0311 (HB0486) Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0119) Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act) Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM