Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Works, Board of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 (SB0498/CH0453)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0114
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 /CH0586 (SB0310/CH0587)
Title
Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426 /CH0589 (SB0311/CH0588)
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems and Funding for Wastewater Treatment Facilities and Sewerage Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 /CH0800 (SB0348/CH0799)
Title
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0845
Title
Education - Public School Indoor Air Quality
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0590
Title
Reorganization of State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1443 (SB0999)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Employee Ownership Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0587 (HB0390/CH0586)
Title
Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589)
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0799 (HB0593/CH0800)
Title
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 /CH0453 (HB0092)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538
Title
Public School Construction - Regulations - Equitable Distribution of Projects and Improvements
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 (HB1443)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0092 (SB0498/CH0453) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0107 Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0155 /CH0114 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0390 /CH0586 (SB0310/CH0587) Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0426 /CH0589 (SB0311/CH0588) Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0537 Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems and Funding for Wastewater Treatment Facilities and Sewerage Systems Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 /CH0800 (SB0348/CH0799) State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0845 Education - Public School Indoor Air Quality Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 /CH0590 Reorganization of State Procurement Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted Areas Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1443 (SB0999) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - House Concur - Senate Amendments
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1638 Employee Ownership Trusts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 /CH0587 (HB0390/CH0586) Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589) Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0348 /CH0799 (HB0593/CH0800) State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0498 /CH0453 (HB0092) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 Public School Construction - Regulations - Equitable Distribution of Projects and Improvements Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0999 (HB1443) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708) State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM