Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0704)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151
Title
Task Force on the Implementation of Tax Benefits for Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 /CH0609
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Parent-Teacher Organization Fundraisers
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523 /CH0484 (SB0486/CH0483)
Title
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Week - School Supplies
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Luxury Surcharge
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Revenue Distributions - Marinas
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1277
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition - Developmental Disabilities Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1487
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales Presumption
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 /CH0483 (HB0523/CH0484)
Title
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0653
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Mass Transit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704 (HB0052)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830
Title
Transportation Financing Act
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0052 (SB0704) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0058 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College Textbooks Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0147 Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0151 Task Force on the Implementation of Tax Benefits for Emergency Preparedness Equipment Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0232 /CH0609 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Parent-Teacher Organization Fundraisers Delegate Vitale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0511 Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - Exemption Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0523 /CH0484 (SB0486/CH0483) Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law Delegate Myers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0666 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Week - School Supplies Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 Sales and Use Tax - Luxury Surcharge Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1210 Waterway Improvement Fund - Revenue Distributions - Marinas Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1214 Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - Application Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1277 Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition - Developmental Disabilities Funding Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1487 Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales Presumption Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0022 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0486 /CH0483 (HB0523/CH0484) Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0653 Sales and Use Tax - Mass Transit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0704 (HB0052) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
SB0830 Transportation Financing Act Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM