Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523 /CH0484 (SB0486/CH0483)
Title
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 (SB0643)
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in County-Owned Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Revenue Distributions - Marinas
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 /CH0483 (HB0523/CH0484)
Title
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in City- or County-Owned Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636
Title
Motor Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Application of Trade-In Value
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0524)
Title
End the Gridlock
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652
Title
Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit Funding
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 /CH0422
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830
Title
Transportation Financing Act
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit Financing
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0176 Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0523 /CH0484 (SB0486/CH0483) Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law Delegate Myers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0524 (SB0643) Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Rules
HB0668 Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in County-Owned Vehicles Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0682 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1210 Waterway Improvement Fund - Revenue Distributions - Marinas Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 /CH0483 (HB0523/CH0484) Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in City- or County-Owned Vehicles Senator Robey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0636 Motor Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Application of Trade-In Value Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0643 (HB0524) End the Gridlock Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0652 Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit Funding Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0829 /CH0422 Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Miller 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
Ways and Means
SB0830 Transportation Financing Act Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB1006 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited Acts Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1013 Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit Financing Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM