Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Downward Adjustment - Decrease in Consumer Price Index
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345 /CH0360 (SB0908/CH0359)
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Vehicle Registration Fee Surcharge
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 /CH0359 (HB1345/CH0360)
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 Motor Fuel Tax - Downward Adjustment - Decrease in Consumer Price Index Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0277 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
HB1345 /CH0360 (SB0908/CH0359) Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits Delegate McHale 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0629 Counties and Municipalities - Vehicle Registration Fee Surcharge Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 /CH0359 (HB1345/CH0360) Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM