Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0664)
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483 (SB0589)
Title
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of Revenue - Local Governments
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0483)
Title
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB0454)
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0174 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0454 (SB0664) Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0483 (SB0589) Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0774 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Ways and Means
HB0899 Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of Revenue - Local Governments Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of Revenue Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0589 (HB0483) Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB0454) Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM