Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072
Title
Extension of Electric Vehicle Incentives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151 (SB0168)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
21st Century Transportation Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Transportation - Vehicle Titling Fee and Vehicle Excise Tax - Active Duty Members of the Military
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 /CH0213
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078
Title
Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Sunset - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 (HB0151)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Electronic Collection and Remission of Vehicle Excise Taxes
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 Extension of Electric Vehicle Incentives Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0151 (SB0168) Clean Cars Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0426 21st Century Transportation Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 Transportation - Vehicle Titling Fee and Vehicle Excise Tax - Active Duty Members of the Military Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1246 /CH0213 Clean Cars Act of 2019 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Sunset - Repeal Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0168 (HB0151) Clean Cars Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1021 Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Electronic Collection and Remission of Vehicle Excise Taxes Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM