Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359 (SB0277)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2020 – Extension, Funding, and Reporting
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1223
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1620
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Farm Vehicles - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 (HB0359)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2020 - Extension, Funding, and Reporting
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Claims for Refund
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0359 (SB0277) Clean Cars Act of 2020 – Extension, Funding, and Reporting Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1223 Clean Cars Act of 2020 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1620 Vehicle Excise Tax - Farm Vehicles - Exemption Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0277 (HB0359) Clean Cars Act of 2020 - Extension, Funding, and Reporting President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0941 Motor Fuel Tax - Claims for Refund Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 11:27 AM