Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0453 (SB0202/CH0452)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0268 (SB0436/CH0267)
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236 /CH0532 (SB0730/CH0531)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling Interest
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0452 (HB0372/CH0453)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0267 (HB1209/CH0268)
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 /CH0531 (HB1236/CH0532)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling Interest
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994
Title
Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0372 /CH0453 (SB0202/CH0452) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1209 /CH0268 (SB0436/CH0267) Recordation Taxes - Exemptions Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 /CH0532 (SB0730/CH0531) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling Interest Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 /CH0452 (HB0372/CH0453) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0267 (HB1209/CH0268) Recordation Taxes - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 /CH0531 (HB1236/CH0532) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling Interest Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0994 Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM